|
Exchange Received Time  29/05/2017 19:58:33 Exchange Disseminated Time 29/05/2017 19:58:39 Time Taken 00:00:06 | 1. Audited Stand Alone and Consolidated Financial results of the company for the quarter and year ended March 31, 2017. 2. The resignation of Mr. Jose George from the position of Company Secretary and Compliance Officer of the company with effect from the close of business hours of May 31, 2017. 3. The appointment of Mr. Binu Thomas (ACS 41851) as the Company Secretary and Compliance Officer of the Company with effect from June 1, 2017. 4. Extension of the tenure of Mr. N. Dharmaraj (DIN: 00912004) as Whole - Time Director of the company for another period of one year from October 1, 2017 to September 30, 2018 subject to the approval of the shareholders at the ensuing annual general meeting |
|
|