|
Exchange Received Time  01/08/2017 14:25:04 Exchange Disseminated Time 01/08/2017 14:25:09 Time Taken 00:00:05 | In compliance to Regulation 30 of SEBI (Listing Obligations and Disclosure Requirements) Regulations 2015, it is to inform that Shri K.M. Singh has ceased to be Chairman & Managing Dircetor of the Company with effect from 31.07.2017 upon attaining the age of superannuation. Further, Ministry of Power vide its letter no. 9/4/2016-NHPC dated 31.07.2017 has entrusted the additional charge of the post of CMD, NHPC to Shri Ratish Kumar, Director (Projects) w.e.f. 01.08.2017 for a period of 3 months or until the post of CMD, NHPC is filled regularly or till further orders, whichever event occurs ealiest. Brief profile of Shri Ratish Kumar is also enclosed. |
|
|