|
Exchange Received Time  01/03/2017 14:31:39 Exchange Disseminated Time 01/03/2017 14:31:46 Time Taken 00:00:07 | In compliance with Regulation 30 of SEBI (Listing Obligations and Disclosure Requirements), Regulations 2015, it is to inform that Shri Mahesh Kumar Mittal has joined as Director (Finance) on the Board of NHPC Limited with effect from 01.03.2017 in pursuance to Ministry of Power order no. 9/2/2016-NHPC dated 28.10.2016. Accordingly, Shri Jayant Kumar has ceased to be Director (Finance) from the Board of NHPC Limited with effect from 28.02.2017 due to his superannuation. Kindly disseminate the information on your website. |
|
|