|
Exchange Received Time  05/08/2017 11:31:58 Exchange Disseminated Time 05/08/2017 11:32:01 Time Taken 00:00:03 | Further to our letter dated 1st August, 2017, we would like to clarify the following: 1.Sri Samarendra Mitra, Independent Director has resigned from the Directorship of the Company effective on and from 3rd August, 2017, i.e he was a Director till 2nd August, 2017 2.Sri Manindra Nath Banerjee, Independent Director has resigned from the Directorship of the Company effective on and from 2nd August, 2017, i.e he was a Director till 1st August, 2017. Kindly take the same on record. |
|
|