|
Exchange Received Time  02/01/2018 12:37:54 Exchange Disseminated Time 02/01/2018 12:37:59 Time Taken 00:00:05 | Pursuant to Regulation 30 of the SEBI (Listing Obligations and Disclosure Requirements) Regulations, 2015, we inform you that upon completion of the term as an Independent Director, as approved by the shareholders at the Annual General Meeting held on July 31, 2014 and in accordance with the retirement age policy for Directors of the Company, Dr Raghunath Mashelkar (DIN: 00074119) ceased to be a Director of the Company with effect from December 31, 2017. Enclosed herewith is the brief details of change of director (Annexure A) as prescribed vide SEBI circular dated September 9, 2015. You are requested to kindly take the above on record. |
|
|