|
Exchange Received Time  16/10/2018 10:51:03 Exchange Disseminated Time 16/10/2018 10:51:14 Time Taken 00:00:11 | With reference to our letter in Ref:Sec/Sto/2018/08/-01 dated August 2, 2018, we would like to inform you that Mr. Thulsidass T V, Company Secretary & Compliance Officer of the Company has ceased to be the Company Secretary and Compliance Officer of the Company with effect from October 12, 2018 consequent upon his resignation intimated to you earlier. Mr. K V Suresh Reddy, Chief Financial Officer has been appointed as the Compliance Officer of the Company with effect from October 13, 2018 until the appointment of a Company Secretary in due Course Kindly take this information into your record and disseminate. |
|
|